IA HF225 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain criminal and civil actions involving sexual offenses and obscene material and minors, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain criminal and civil actions involving sexual offenses and obscene material and minors, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 8:00AM RM 19. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Salmon and Wolfe. H.J. 394. |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 207. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF225 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF225.html |