IA HF2248 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to robbery in the first degree, robbery in the second degree, and the applicable statutes of limitations. (Formerly HSB 503.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to robbery in the first degree, robbery in the second degree, and the applicable statutes of limitations. (Formerly HSB 503.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseFiscal note.
2024-04-10HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 772.
2024-04-10HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772.
2024-03-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 611.
2024-03-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 585.
2024-03-19SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 582.
2024-03-19SenateSubstituted for SF 2282. S.J. 582.
2024-03-14SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
2024-02-28SenateFiscal note.
2024-02-20SenateRead first time, attached to SF 2282. S.J. 350.
2024-02-20SenateMessage from House. S.J. 350.
2024-02-20HouseImmediate message. H.J. 335.
2024-03-04HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 495.
2024-02-20HousePassed House, yeas 74, nays 21. H.J. 331.
2024-02-20HouseAmendment H-8024 adopted. H.J. 331.
2024-02-19HouseFiscal note.
2024-02-19HouseAmendment H-8024 filed. H.J. 318.
2024-01-31HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 169.

Same As/Similar To

HSB503 (Related) 2024-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2248.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback