IA HF2246 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to provisional licensing of interns enrolled in a doctoral degree program in psychology. (Formerly HF 2017.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to provisional licensing of interns enrolled in a doctoral degree program in psychology. (Formerly HF 2017.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 944. |
2022-06-01 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 871. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 835. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 834. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 450. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2022 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 423. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 397. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 397. |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 419. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 97 yeas, 1 nay. H.J. 408. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 174. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2017 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.