IA HF2233 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to agreements limiting the locations of practice of persons licensed to practice medicine and surgery, osteopathic medicine and surgery, or pharmacy.
Title
A bill for an act relating to agreements limiting the locations of practice of persons licensed to practice medicine and surgery, osteopathic medicine and surgery, or pharmacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bacon and Winckler. H.J. 242. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 170. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2233 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2233.html |