IA HF2233 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 768.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens, public construction liens, and the early release of retained funds. (Formerly HSB 524.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to mechanics’ liens, public construction liens, and the early release of retained funds. (Formerly HSB 524.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 768. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 767. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 861. |
2018-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 732. |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed House, ayes 69, nays 29. H.J. 724. |
2018-04-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8332. H.J. 724. |
2018-03-27 | House | Senate amendment H-8332 filed. H.J. 691. |
2018-03-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 681. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 791. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 784. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5190 filed, lost. S.J. 783. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5191 filed, adopted. S.J. 783. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2236. S.J. 783. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 692. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 2236. S.J. 463. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 463. |
2018-02-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 405. |
2018-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 425. |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 57 nays 40. H.J. 399. |
2018-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8109 adopted. H.J. 398. |
2018-02-26 | House | Amendment H-8109 filed. H.J. 395. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 202. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB524 (Related) 2018-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.