IA HF223 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 869.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 869.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the application of foreign laws and constitutional rights and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the application of foreign laws and constitutional rights and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 869. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 505. |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Heartsill, Carlin and Lensing. H.J. 248. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 226. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF223 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF223.html |