IA HF222 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for the reduction of certain funding and budgets for public schools, community colleges, and regents institutions following the use of specified curriculum and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for the reduction of certain funding and budgets for public schools, community colleges, and regents institutions following the use of specified curriculum and including effective date and applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
2021-02-08HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 2:00PM RM 19.
2021-02-02HouseSubcommittee reassigned: Wheeler, Smith and Stone. H.J. 282.
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee: Wheeler, Salmon and Smith. H.J. 255.
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced, referred to Education. H.J. 206.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback