IA HF2217 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to lobbyist's client reports, including verification of and the filing location for the reports, and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2550.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to lobbyist's client reports, including verification of and the filing location for the reports, and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2550.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329. |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Donahue and Lundgren. H.J. 250. |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 179. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2550 (Similar To) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 354.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2217 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2217.html |