IA HF221 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a transportation aid supplement program for certain school districts, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 539.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a transportation aid supplement program for certain school districts, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 539.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Gassman, Bossman and Staed. H.J. 129. |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Gassman, Forristall and Hanson. H.J. 245. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 226. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF221 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF221.html |