IA HF2205 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 11:00AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for the future repeal of the beverage containers control program, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for the future repeal of the beverage containers control program, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 11:00AM House Lounge.
2020-02-11HouseSubcommittee: Lohse, Jones and McKean. H.J. 250.
2020-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 177.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback