IA HF2196 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 642.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to setoff requirements concerning certain winnings on wagers. (Formerly HSB 502; See HF 2623.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to setoff requirements concerning certain winnings on wagers. (Formerly HSB 502; See HF 2623.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 642. |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 569. |
2020-02-25 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Hunter and Osmundson. H.J. 199. |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 170. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB502 (Related) 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 167.
HF2623 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
HF2623 (Similar To) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2196 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2196.html |