IA HF2195 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 5:00PM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 5:00PM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to written reports required if a driver is involved in an accident resulting in injury, death, or property damage.
Title
A bill for an act relating to written reports required if a driver is involved in an accident resulting in injury, death, or property damage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 5:00PM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled). |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Cisneros and Sunde. H.J. 257. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 156. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2195 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2195.html |