IA HF2195 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practices of cosmetology and barbering in movable locations. (Formerly HF 167.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practices of cosmetology and barbering in movable locations. (Formerly HF 167.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 416. |
2020-03-02 | House | SF 155 substituted. H.J. 413. |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8049 adopted. H.J. 413. |
2020-02-27 | House | Amendment H-8049 filed. H.J. 407. |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 170. |
Same As/Similar To
SF128 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Schultz. S.J. 727.
HF167 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
HF167 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 416.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2195 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2195.html |