IA HF2194 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexually violent predators, the accumulation of earned time by offenders, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 555.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexually violent predators, the accumulation of earned time by offenders, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 555.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594. |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 188. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3034 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB555 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2147 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
HSB555 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2147 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2356 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2194 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2194.html |