IA HF2193 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 753.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 753.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a text messaging notification and payment system for certain citations and informations. (Formerly HSB 508.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a text messaging notification and payment system for certain citations and informations. (Formerly HSB 508.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 672. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Bowman, and Carlin. S.J. 444. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 409. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 409. |
2018-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2018-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 341. |
2018-02-06 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 188. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB508 (Related) 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.