IA HF2186 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the boards of directors of school districts to engage independent contractors to serve as dyslexia specialists.(See HF 2543.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the boards of directors of school districts to engage independent contractors to serve as dyslexia specialists.(See HF 2543.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2543. |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 302. |
2022-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 11:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Brink, Mascher and Salmon. H.J. 176. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 154. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2543 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 437.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2186 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2186.html |