IA HF2184 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for licensed professions and occupations.(See HF 2486.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for licensed professions and occupations.(See HF 2486.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 481. |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2486. |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 249. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 8:15AM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Harris, Baeth and Wulf. H.J. 184. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 147. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2486 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee: Koelker, Westrich, and Winckler. S.J. 457.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2184 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2184.html |