IA HF2182 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to area education agencies, including consolidating the area education agencies, modifying the teacher salary supplement state cost per pupil calculation, and modifying the employment terms of certain specified employees of area education agencies.(See HSB 727, HF 2580.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to area education agencies, including consolidating the area education agencies, modifying the teacher salary supplement state cost per pupil calculation, and modifying the employment terms of certain specified employees of area education agencies.(See HSB 727, HF 2580.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2022 1:00PM RM 304. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Gobble, Dolecheck and Mascher. H.J. 208. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Fry and Mascher. H.J. 176. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 153. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB727 (Related) 2022-03-30 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2580.
HF2580 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HF2580 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2182 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2182.html |