IA HF2172 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 692.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 692.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 557.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting pyramid promotional schemes and making penalties applicable. (Formerly HSB 557.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce. S.J. 692. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2178. S.J. 409. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 409. |
2018-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2018-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 340. |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 178. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB557 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3051 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2178 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 692.
SSB3051 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2178 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Commerce. S.J. 692.