IA HF2166 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act increasing the speed limit on certain roads, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act increasing the speed limit on certain roads, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Sieck, Carlson and Williams. H.J. 189. |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 155. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2166 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2166.html |