IA HF2166 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the management of the spread of diseases in wild animals and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2466.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the management of the spread of diseases in wild animals and making penalties applicable. (See HF 2466.)
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Baxter [R] | Rep. Shannon Lundgren [R] | Rep. Scott Ourth [D] | Rep. Charles Holz [R] |
Rep. Peter Cownie [R] | Rep. Chip Baltimore [R] | Rep. Todd Prichard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 459. |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Baxter, Cownie and Nielsen. H.J. 192. |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 177. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2466 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Amendment H-8392 filed. H.J. 823.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2166 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2166.html |