IA HF2164 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the classification of property enrolled in the federal conservation reserve program and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 500.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the classification of property enrolled in the federal conservation reserve program and including applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 500.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM RM 304. |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Gjerde and Wheeler. H.J. 182. |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 147. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB500 (Related) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2164.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2164 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2164.html |