IA HF2155 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for specified limitations regarding fees and fines applicable to alarm system contractors, and providing an effective date.
Title
A bill for an act providing for specified limitations regarding fees and fines applicable to alarm system contractors, and providing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Mohr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Hunter and Lundgren. H.J. 162. |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 147. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2155 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2155.html |