IA HF2151 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services regions. (See HF 2555.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services regions. (See HF 2555.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 319. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 7:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bergan and Ehlert. H.J. 152. |
2020-01-28 | House | Sponsor added, A. Meyer. H.J. 147. |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 146. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2555 (Similar To) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 355.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2151 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2151.html |