IA HF2150 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, and providing penalties. (See HF 2430.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, and providing penalties. (See HF 2430.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Gaines and Klein. H.J. 192. |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 168. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2430 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2150 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2150.html |