IA HF2149 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act pertaining to instruction in water safety in schools.
Title
A bill for an act pertaining to instruction in water safety in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Hanusa, Donahue and Shipley. H.J. 162. |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 146. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2052 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2020 3:30PM RM 315.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2149 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2149.html |