IA HF2147 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 943.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to the U.S.S. Iowa and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2002.) Effective date: 06/13/2022.
Title
A bill for an act making an appropriation to support efforts relating to the U.S.S. Iowa and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2002.) Effective date: 06/13/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the House concur in the Senate amendment H–8388? (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - Shall the House concur in the Senate amendment H–8388? (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 943. |
2022-06-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 915. |
2022-05-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-24 | House | NOBA: Final |
2022-05-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 69, nays 24. H.J. 920. |
2022-05-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8388, yeas 56, nays 37. H.J. 919. |
2022-05-24 | House | Senate amendment H-8388 filed. H.J. 940. |
2022-05-24 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 905. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 893. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 7. S.J. 892. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Amendment S-5117 adopted. S.J. 892. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5117 filed. S.J. 711. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 682. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2022 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 471. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 437. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 437. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 456. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 443. |
2022-01-31 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 141. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2002 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
SF2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2175. S.J. 197.
SF2175 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2175. S.J. 197.
SF2175 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.