IA HF2140 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the expungement of domestic abuse and sexual abuse dismissals.(See HF 2419.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the expungement of domestic abuse and sexual abuse dismissals.(See HF 2419.)
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Wolfe [D] | Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 419. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2419. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 262. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:30AM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Lohse and Wolfe. H.J. 160. |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 140. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2419 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2140 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2140.html |