IA HF2140 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to patient education prior to the prescription of an opioid.
Title
A bill for an act relating to patient education prior to the prescription of an opioid.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Meyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-01-29 | House | Sponsor added, Isenhart. H.J. 158. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Osmundson, Forbes and Meyer, A.. H.J. 152. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Salmon and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 151. |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 144. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2140 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2140.html |