IA HF2137 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public safety, including by creating a public safety equipment fund and by providing for the display of a special registration sticker on certain motor vehicles in lieu of a front registration plate, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public safety, including by creating a public safety equipment fund and by providing for the display of a special registration sticker on certain motor vehicles in lieu of a front registration plate, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
Rep. John Landon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Lohse and Williams. H.J. 151. |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 138. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2137 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2137.html |