IA HF2129 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 392, HF 75.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 392, HF 75.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 181. |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 128. |
Same As/Similar To
SF46 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 330. S.J. 339.
HF75 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 392.
HF392 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2129.
SF330 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2141. S.J. 172.
SF2141 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 621.
HF75 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 392.
HF392 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2129.
SF330 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2141. S.J. 172.
SF2141 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 621.