IA HF212 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the operation of the board of medicine, the board of nursing, the board of pharmacy, and the dental board. (See HF 710.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the operation of the board of medicine, the board of nursing, the board of pharmacy, and the dental board. (See HF 710.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 582.
2019-03-06HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 418.
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-02-04HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
2019-02-04HouseSubcommittee: Fry, Matson, Meyer, A.. H.J. 205.
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 201.

Same As/Similar To

HF710 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Subcommittee: Greene, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 695.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback