IA HF2117 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the development of an implementation plan for a centralized direct care workforce database.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the development of an implementation plan for a centralized direct care workforce database.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Matson and Salmon. |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 129. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3190 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Garrett, and Jochum.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2117 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2117.html |