IA HF2114 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to minors using mobile devices, including protections for minors, civil liability, and providing penalties.(See HF 2546.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to minors using mobile devices, including protections for minors, civil liability, and providing penalties.(See HF 2546.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2546. |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 259. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Thomson, C. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 170. |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 120. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2546 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2114 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2114.html |