IA HF210 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal, and providing penalties.(See HF 2537.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicles that traverse certain railroad grade crossings against a gate or signal, and providing penalties.(See HF 2537.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 581. |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2537. |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 294. |
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 8:15AM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Siegrist, Best and Meyer, B. H.J. 257. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Maxwell and Meyer, B. H.J. 242. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Maxwell and Meyer, B.. H.J. 282. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 541.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF210 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF210.html |