IA HF2097 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Subcommittee: Zaun, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 623.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act requiring the installation and maintenance of adult changing stations at highway rest areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring the installation and maintenance of adult changing stations at highway rest areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSubcommittee: Zaun, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 623.
2020-03-11SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 589.
2020-03-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 589.
2020-03-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 564.
2020-03-10HousePassed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 539.
2020-03-10HouseAmendment H-8017 withdrawn. H.J. 539.
2020-02-17HouseAmendment H-8017 filed. H.J. 287.
2020-02-07HouseFiscal note.
2020-02-07HousePlaced on calendar. H.J. 221.
2020-02-07HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 221.
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 221.
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2020 12:00PM House Lounge.
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee: Meyer, A., Huseman and Sunde. H.J. 151.
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 117.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback