IA HF2096 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing a sales tax exemption for the furnishing of parking facilities services.
Title
A bill for an act providing a sales tax exemption for the furnishing of parking facilities services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2024 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Kniff McCulla, Croken and Deyoe. H.J. 232. |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 115. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2096 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2096.html |