IA HF2092 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2452.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor grader operator training.(See HF 2452.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor grader operator training.(See HF 2452.)
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Wulf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2452. |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 235. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 1:45PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Wulf, Cooling and Latham. H.J. 153. |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 115. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2452 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 241.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2092 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2092.html |