IA HF2086 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the taking of nuisance animals on property outside of city limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the taking of nuisance animals on property outside of city limits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01HouseTabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0.
2024-01-30HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
2024-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
2024-01-23HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
2024-01-23HouseSubcommittee: Fisher, Gehlbach and Zabner. H.J. 123.
2024-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 114.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback