IA HF2074 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to waiver of the placement investigations and reports related to the adoption of a minor by a minor's legal guardian.(See HF 2414.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to waiver of the placement investigations and reports related to the adoption of a minor by a minor's legal guardian.(See HF 2414.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 489. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2414. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 261. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Gustafson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 118. |
2022-01-24 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 110. |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2414 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2074 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2074.html |