IA HF2072 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing shared operational function supplemental weighting for licensed social workers and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See HF 2279; HF 2406.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing shared operational function supplemental weighting for licensed social workers and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See HF 2279; HF 2406.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 441. |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, P. Miller and Moore, T.. H.J. 141. |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 132. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2279 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 441.
HF2406 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1002.
HF2406 (Similar To) 2018-05-01 - Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1002.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2072 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2072.html |