IA HF2069 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft. (See See HF 2473.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft. (See See HF 2473.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Rizer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Rizer, Gaskill and Hein. H.J. 217. |
2018-02-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 125. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2069 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2069.html |