IA HF2060 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2548.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2548.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to world language instruction in grades nine through twelve by prohibiting the incorporation of gender-neutral language when the world language being taught utilizes a grammatical gender system.(See HF 2548.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions related to world language instruction in grades nine through twelve by prohibiting the incorporation of gender-neutral language when the world language being taught utilizes a grammatical gender system.(See HF 2548.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2548. |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 269. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2024 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Matson and Stone. H.J. 109. |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 97. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2548 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2060 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2060.html |