IA HF2051 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax certain pay received by members of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax certain pay received by members of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Graber, Nordman and Staed. H.J. 117. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 101. |