IA HF2040 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the review of a child support order based upon an obligor’s qualification for a low-income adjustment. (See HF 2426.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the review of a child support order based upon an obligor’s qualification for a low-income adjustment. (See HF 2426.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Heartsill, Bennett and Koester. H.J. 129. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 114. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2426 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2040 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2040.html |