IA HF2039 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain athletic competitions between institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain athletic competitions between institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Ingels [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2022 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Ingels, Fry and Smith. H.J. 88. |
2022-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 85. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2039 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2039.html |