IA HF2033 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Jacoby and Windschitl. H.J. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Jacoby and Windschitl. H.J. 307.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the designation of voluntary income tax contributions on the Iowa individual income tax return and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the designation of voluntary income tax contributions on the Iowa individual income tax return and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Vander Linden, Jacoby and Windschitl. H.J. 307. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sponsor added, Holt. H.J. 140. |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 109. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3077 (Related) 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2018 12:30PM RM 315
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2033 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2033.html |