IA HF2030 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight and verification of income eligibility.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight and verification of income eligibility.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Salmon and Wilburn. H.J. 123. |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 93. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2030 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2030.html |