IA HF203 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the use of primary road fund moneys for the secondary road and municipal street systems. (Formerly HSB 9.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the use of primary road fund moneys for the secondary road and municipal street systems. (Formerly HSB 9.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 769. |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 708. |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 708. |
2017-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 579. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Explanations of votes. S.J. 607. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 578. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for SF 184. S.J. 577. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 184. S.J. 256. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 256. |
2017-02-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 256. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 41. H.J. 256. |
2017-02-09 | House | Speaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Speaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 255. |
2017-02-09 | House | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 254. |
2017-02-07 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 182. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB9 (Related) 2017-03-09 - Passed subcommittee.