IA HF2024 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state agency authority relating to purchasing procedures and executive branch employee travel claims.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state agency authority relating to purchasing procedures and executive branch employee travel claims.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Oldson and Watts. H.J. 141. |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 86. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB676 (Related) 2018-03-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2018 3:30PM House Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2024 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2024.html |